Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Garabed (Carlo) Kiciurian (Ketchourian)

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Erzerum (Garin) (Armenian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jul 1847Born
23 Sep 189043.1AppointedBishop of Erzerum (Garin) (Armenian)
16 Dec 189043.4Ordained BishopBishop of Erzerum (Garin) (Armenian)
Sep 1911³64.1ResignedBishop of Erzerum (Garin) (Armenian)
Aug 1916³69.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Erzerum (Garin) (Armenian)

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Garabed (Carlo) Kiciurian (Ketchourian)
Bishop Garabed (Carlo) Kiciurian (Ketchourian) (born , died Aug 1916) Bishop Emeritus of Erzerum (Garin)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceErzerum
Ordained BishopIstanbul

  • a bishop for 25.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1923
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 263
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1890, Number 79

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 25 May 2017