Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Marino Marini

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Orvieto, Italy

Titular Archbishop of Palmyra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Mar 1804Born
19 Jun 185753.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Palmyra
12 Jul 185753.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Palmyra
14 Aug 185753.4AppointedApostolic Delegate to Argentina
14 Aug 185753.4AppointedApostolic Delegate to Bolivia
14 Aug 185753.4AppointedApostolic Delegate to Chile
14 Aug 185753.4AppointedApostolic Delegate to Uruguay
14 Aug 185753.4AppointedApostolic Delegate to Paraguay
27 Mar 186561.0AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Orvieto, Italy
13 Mar 186864.0AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for Extraordinary Ecclesiastical Affairs
13 Mar 186864.0AppointedPro-Substitute (Sostituto) of the Secretariat of State
1871²66.8AppointedSubstitute (Sostituto) of the Secretariat of State
15 Oct 187167.6ResignedBishop of Orvieto, Italy
17 Oct 187167.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Palmyra
23 Sep 187571.5ResignedSubstitute (Sostituto) of the Secretariat of State
25 Sep 187571.5ResignedSecretary of the Congregation for Extraordinary Ecclesiastical Affairs
15 Apr 188581.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Orvieto, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Marino Marini
Archbishop Marino Marini (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Orvieto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAscoli Piceno, Diocese of Ascoli Piceno
Ordained BishopCathedral, Ascoli Piceno, Diocese of Ascoli Piceno
Death PlaceAscoli Piceno, Diocese of Ascoli Piceno

  • a bishop for 27.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 436, and Page 575
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1857, Number 34
  • x933/xsta: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 22, and Page 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast