Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio O˝a de Echave

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Lugo, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jul 1905Born
24 Mar 192822.6Ordained PriestPriest
27 Mar 195650.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lugo, Spain
27 Mar 195650.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Dystis
10 Jun 195650.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dystis
24 May 196155.8AppointedBishop of Lugo, Spain
25 Jul 197974.0RetiredBishop of Lugo, Spain
1 Apr 198781.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Lugo, Spain

MicroData Summary for Antonio O˝a de Echave
Bishop Antonio O˝a de Echave (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Lugo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCarcar

  • a priest for 59.0 years
  • a bishop for 30.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1956, Number 50

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast