Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Łukasz Baraniecki

Deceased

Archbishop of Lviv


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Oct 1798BornKabarowie
6 Oct 182224.0Ordained PriestPriest
30 Mar 184950.5SelectedArchbishop of Lviv, Ukraine
28 Sep 184951.0ConfirmedArchbishop of Lviv, Ukraine
13 Jan 185051.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Lviv, Ukraine
30 Jun 185859.7DiedArchbishop of Lviv, Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Łukasz Baraniecki:
Archbishop Łukasz Baraniecki (born , died ) Archbishop of Lviv

  • a priest for 35.7 years
  • a bishop for 8.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 339

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013