Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Rudolf Johannes Joseph Rainier Cardinal von Habsburg-Lotharingen

Deceased

Archbishop of Olomouc

Cardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Montorio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jan 1788BornPisa, Italy
24 Jun 180517.4SelectedCoadjutor Archbishop of Olomouc, Czech Republic
9 Sep 180517.6ConfirmedCoadjutor Archbishop of Olomouc, Czech Republic
15 Sep 181123.6ResignedCoadjutor Archbishop of Olomouc, Czech Republic
24 Mar 181931.2SelectedArchbishop of Olomouc, Czech Republic
4 Jun 181931.4Elevated to Cardinal
4 Jun 181931.4ConfirmedArchbishop of Olomouc, Czech Republic
4 Jun 181931.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Montorio
24 Aug 181931.6Ordained DeaconDeacon
29 Aug 181931.6Ordained PriestPriest
26 Sep 181931.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Olomouc, Czech Republic
24 Jul 183143.5DiedArchbishop of Olomouc, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Rudolf Johannes Joseph Rainier von Habsburg-Lotharingen
Rudolf Johannes Joseph Rainier Cardinal von Habsburg-Lotharingen (born , died ) Archbishop of Olomouc

  • a priest for 11.9 years
  • a bishop for 11.8 years
  • a cardinal for 12.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 111, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 290, and Page 291
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1819, Number 49
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 4 Jun 1819

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 16 May 2016