Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Johann Hugo von Orsbeck

Deceased

Archbishop of Trier

Bishop of Speyer


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jan 1634BornGro▀vernich
7 Jan 167237.9SelectedCoadjutor Archbishop of Trier, Germany
12 Dec 167238.8ConfirmedCoadjutor Archbishop of Trier, Germany
12 Dec 167238.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Larissa in Thessalia
24 Mar 167440.1Ordained PriestPriest
16 Jul 167541.4SelectedBishop of Speyer, Germany
1 Jun 167642.3SucceededArchbishop of Trier, Germany
23 Jul 167642.4InstalledArchbishop of Trier, Germany
10 May 167743.2ConfirmedBishop of Speyer, Germany
7 Nov 167743.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Trier, Germany
6 Jan 171176.9DiedArchbishop of Trier, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann Hugo von Orsbeck:
Archbishop Johann Hugo von Orsbeck (born , died ) Archbishop of Trier

  • a priest for 36.7 years
  • a bishop for 33.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bisch÷fe des Heiligen R÷mischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 237, and Page 362
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 387
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 209, Number 17,207
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1677, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 24 Apr 2015