Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Severo Leonardo Andriani Escofet

Deceased

Bishop of Pamplona (-Tudela)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Nov 1774BornBarcelona
1800¹25.2Ordained PriestPriest
19 Dec 182955.1SelectedBishop of Pamplona, Spain
15 Mar 183055.4ConfirmedBishop of Pamplona, Spain
13 Jun 183055.6Ordained BishopBishop of Pamplona, Spain
24 Sep 186186.9DiedBishop of Pamplona (-Tudela), Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Severo Leonardo Andriani Escofet:
Bishop Severo Leonardo Andriani Escofet (born , died ) Bishop of Pamplona (-Tudela)

  • a priest for 61.7 years
  • a bishop for 31.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 297
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 147, Number 797

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 28 Oct 2013