Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pablo Sitjar Ruata

Deceased

Bishop of Barcelona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jan 1747BornEstana
24 Jul 179750.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Barcelona, Spain
24 Jul 179750.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Geras
28 Oct 179750.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Geras
7 Jan 180860.9SelectedBishop of Barcelona, Spain
16 Mar 180861.1ConfirmedBishop of Barcelona, Spain
21 Aug 183184.5DiedBishop of Barcelona, Spain

MicroData Summary for Pablo Sitjar Ruata
Bishop Pablo Sitjar Ruata (born , died ) Bishop of Barcelona

  • a bishop for 33.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 105
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 224
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 115, Number 604
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1797, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 6 Mar 2016