Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Álvarez Osorio

Deceased

Bishop of Plasencia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1632¹BornAstorga
12 Dec 167240.9AppointedBishop of León, Spain
5 Mar 167341.1Ordained BishopBishop of León, Spain
22 Jan 168048.0AppointedBishop of Plasencia, Spain
12 Mar 168048.1DiedBishop of Plasencia, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Álvarez Osorio:
Bishop Juan Álvarez Osorio (born 1632, died ) Bishop of Plasencia

  • a bishop for 7.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 240, and Page 316
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 210, Number 1,310
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1673, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015