Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel Pérez Cevallos

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Toledo

Titular Bishop of Arcadiopolis in Asia


Events

DateEventTitle
21 Jan 1660AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Toledo, Spain
21 Jan 1660AppointedTitular Bishop of Arcadiopolis in Asia
3 Oct 1660Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arcadiopolis in Asia
2 Oct 1681DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Toledo, Spain

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Miguel Pérez Cevallos:
Bishop Miguel Pérez Cevallos (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Toledo

  • a bishop for 20.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 91
  • bp/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 193, Number 1,213
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1660, Number 48

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 2 Apr 2015