Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joannes Obcalocesien (Ohannessian, Chanessian)

Deceased

Bishop of Ancira (Angora) (Armenian), Turkey


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Oct 1852Born
19 Apr 188734.5AppointedBishop of Musc (Armenian), Armenia
19 Aug 188734.8Ordained BishopBishop of Musc (Armenian), Armenia
12 Nov 188937.0ResignedBishop of Musc (Armenian), Armenia
23 Sep 189037.9AppointedBishop of Ancira (Angora) (Armenian), Turkey
Apr 1899³46.4DiedBishop of Ancira (Angora) (Armenian), Turkey

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joannes Obcalocesien (Ohannessian, Chanessian)
Bishop Joannes Obcalocesien (Ohannessian, Chanessian) (born , died Apr 1899) Bishop of Ancira (Angora)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKarput
Ordained BishopIstanbul

  • a bishop for 11.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 100, and Page 397
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1887, Number 30
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1888, Page 206

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 May 2017