Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis-François de La Baume de Suze

Deceased

Bishop of Viviers (Aps)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1602¹BornSuze la Rousse
13 Nov 161715.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Viviers (Aps), France
13 Nov 161715.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Pompeiopolis in Cilicia
6 Apr 162119.2SucceededBishop of Viviers (Aps), France
17 Dec 162826.9Ordained BishopBishop of Viviers (Aps), France
5 Sep 169088.6DiedBishop of Viviers (Aps), France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Louis-François de La Baume de Suze:
Bishop Louis-François de La Baume de Suze (died ) Bishop of Viviers (Aps)

  • a bishop for 61.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 371
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1628, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 2 Mar 2015