Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antoine d’Arbaut de Bargemont

Deceased

Bishop of Sisteron


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Nov 1602BornAix
1627¹24.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
1638¹35.1Ordained PriestPriest
8 Jul 164845.6SelectedBishop of Sisteron, France
28 Sep 164845.8ConfirmedBishop of Sisteron, France
7 Feb 164946.2Ordained BishopBishop of Sisteron, France
26 May 166663.5DiedBishop of Sisteron, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antoine d’Arbaut de Bargemont:
Bishop Antoine d’Arbaut de Bargemont (born , died ) Bishop of Sisteron

  • a priest for 28.4 years
  • a bishop for 17.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 318
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1649, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015