Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Calixto Paulino Esono Abaga Obono

Bishop of Evinayong, Equatorial Guinea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Mar 1969 Born
22 Dec 200031.7Ordained PriestPriest of Bata, Equatorial Guinea
1 Apr 201748.0AppointedBishop of Evinayong, Equatorial Guinea
20 May 201748.1Ordained BishopBishop of Evinayong, Equatorial Guinea
21 May 201748.1InstalledBishop of Evinayong, Equatorial Guinea

MicroData Summary for Calixto Paulino Esono Abaga Obono
Bishop Calixto Paulino Esono Abaga Obono (born ) Bishop of Evinayong

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEbang-Zomo, Diocese of Bata
Ordained BishopIn front of Inmaculada Concepción, Basilica, Mongomo, Diocese of Mongomo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Evinayong.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 1 Apr 2017
  • loc: CB, 6 May 2017
  • i: CB, 21 May 2017
  • c34: CB, 22 May 2017
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 232, Number 19,428

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 10 Jul 2017