Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Yibin [Suifu]

Dioecesis Siufuana



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Peter Luo Xuegang, Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 11 April 1946
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Chongqing [Chungking]
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: China
  • Mailing Address: Catholic Mission, Bishop's House, Shungking, Szechwan, China

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Southern Szechwan {Se-Ciuen Meridionale}
24 January 1860ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Southeastern Szechwan {Se-Ciuen Meridio-Orientale} Vicariate Apostolic of Southern Szechwan {Se-Ciuen Meridionale} (erected)
12 August 1910Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Southern Szechwan {Se-Ciuen Meridionale} Vicariate Apostolic of Kienchang (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Suifu [Yibin]
3 December 1924Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Southern Szechwan {Se-Ciuen Meridionale} Vicariate Apostolic of Suifu [Yibin]
10 July 1929Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Suifu [Yibin] Prefecture Apostolic of Yachow (erected)
Diocese of Yibin [Suifu]
11 April 1946ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Suifu [Yibin] Diocese of Yibin [Suifu]

Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_d, v3.3.5, 7 Apr 2021; Data: 7 Apr 2021

Quantcast