Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Xichang [NingyŁan]

Dioecesis Nimiuenensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • John Lei Jiapei, Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 11 April 1946
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Chongqing [Chungking]
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: China
  • Square Kilometers: 120,000 (46,350 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Catholic Mission, Bishop's House, Xichang, Sichuan, China

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Kienchang
12 August 1910ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Southern Szechwan {Se-Ciuen Meridionale} Vicariate Apostolic of Kienchang (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of NingyŁanfu
3 December 1924Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Kienchang Vicariate Apostolic of NingyŁanfu
Diocese of Xichang [NingyŁan]
11 April 1946ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of NingyŁanfu Diocese of Xichang [NingyŁan]

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Xichang [NingyŁan]
195011,1432,000,000.6%3323531863617ap2002

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_d, v3.3.2, 24 Dec 2019; Data: 20 Jan 2020

Quantcast