Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Matthias Li Jun-ho (Li Rongzhao, Ly Yun-ho)

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Yachow, China

Titular Bishop of Tlos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Sep 1877Born
22 Jan 191032.3Ordained PriestPriest
22 Oct 192952.1AppointedPrefect of Yachow, China
16 Mar 193355.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Tlos
16 Mar 193355.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Yachow, China
11 Jun 193355.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tlos
4 Aug 193557.8DiedVicar Apostolic of Yachow, China

MicroData Summary for Matthias Li Jun-ho (Li Rongzhao, Ly Yun-ho)
Bishop Matthias Li Jun-ho (Li Rongzhao, Ly Yun-ho) (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Yachow

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHinwenshien (Suifu)
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceSuifu

  • a priest for 25.5 years
  • a bishop for 2.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1933
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1936
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1933, Number 33
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast