Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Xiwanzi-Chongli [Siwantze]

Dioecesis Sivanzeana



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 11 April 1946
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Hohhot [Suiyüan]
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: China
  • Square Kilometers: 250,000 (96,562 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Catholic Mission, Bishop's House, Chongli-Xiwanzi, Hohhot, China

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Mongolia
28 August 1840ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Liaotung Vicariate Apostolic of Kansu [Gansu] (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Mongolia (erected)
21 December 1883Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Mongolia Vicariate Apostolic of Southwestern Mongolia {Mongolia Occiduo-Meridionale} (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Eastern Mongolia {Mongolia Orientale} (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Central Mongolia {Mongolia Centrale}
21 December 1883Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Mongolia Vicariate Apostolic of Central Mongolia {Mongolia Centrale}
14 March 1922Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Central Mongolia {Mongolia Centrale} Mission "Sui Iuris" of Outer Mongolia (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Tchagar
14 March 1922Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Central Mongolia {Mongolia Centrale} Vicariate Apostolic of Tchagar
Vicariate Apostolic of Siwantze [Chongli-Xiwanzi]
3 December 1924Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Tchagar Vicariate Apostolic of Siwantze [Chongli-Xiwanzi]
8 February 1929Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Siwantze [Chongli-Xiwanzi] Vicariate Apostolic of Tsining [Jining] (erected)
Diocese of Xiwanzi-Chongli [Siwantze]
11 April 1946ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Siwantze [Chongli-Xiwanzi] Diocese of Xiwanzi-Chongli [Siwantze]

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Xiwanzi-Chongli [Siwantze]
195040,725700,0005.8%33397256583ap1951

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_d, v3.3.5, 7 Apr 2021; Data: 13 Apr 2021

Quantcast