Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Jinzhou [Jehol]

Dioecesis Geholensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 11 April 1946
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Shenyang [Mukden, Fengtien]
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: China
  • Mailing Address: Catholic Mission, Bishop's House, Jinzhou, Chaoyang, Liaoning, China

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Eastern Mongolia {Mongolia Orientale}
21 December 1883ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Mongolia Vicariate Apostolic of Southwestern Mongolia {Mongolia Occiduo-Meridionale} (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Eastern Mongolia {Mongolia Orientale} (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Jehol [Jinzhou]
3 December 1924Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Eastern Mongolia {Mongolia Orientale} Vicariate Apostolic of Jehol [Jinzhou]
9 July 1928Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Jehol [Jinzhou]
Vicariate Apostolic of Kirin [Jilin]
Mission "Sui Iuris" of Tsitsihar [Qiqihar] (erected)
2 August 1929Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Jehol [Jinzhou]
Vicariate Apostolic of Moukden
Prefecture Apostolic of Szepingkai (erected)
21 January 1932Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Jehol [Jinzhou] Prefecture Apostolic of Chihfeng [Chifeng] (erected)
Diocese of Jinzhou [Jehol]
11 April 1946ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Jehol [Jinzhou] Diocese of Jinzhou [Jehol]
22 September 2018Territory LostDiocese of Chifeng [Chihfeng]
Diocese of Jinzhou [Jehol]
Diocese of Chengde (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Jinzhou [Jehol]
195031,8455,235,341.6%205676419474640ap1951

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_d, v3.3.2, 24 Dec 2019; Data: 25 Jan 2020

Quantcast