Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Luis Cardinal de La Palud, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne, France

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1370¹Born
6 Jun 143161.4AppointedBishop of Lausanne, Switzerland
4 Nov 143363.8AppointedBishop of Avignon, France
12 Apr 144070.2Elevated to Cardinal
Jul 1441³71.5AppointedBishop of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne, France
19 Dec 144979.9Elevated to Cardinal
12 Jan 145080.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia
21 Sep 145181.7DiedBishop of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain ; ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Luis de La Palud (VIAF: 205034998)
Luis Cardinal de La Palud O.S.B. (born 1370, died ) Bishop of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChâtillon La Palud
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)San Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a cardinal for 11.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 173, and Page 100
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Dec 1449

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 15 Mar 2021

Quantcast