Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Cochin

Dioecesis Coccinensis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Joseph Kariyil, Bishop
  • John Thattumkal, S.S.C., Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 4 February 1558
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Verapoly
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: India
  • Square Kilometers: 236 (91 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.dioceseofcochin.org/
  • Mailing Address: Bishop's House, Fort Cochin, Kochi-682001, Kerala, India
  • Telephone: (0484)2215.400
  • Fax: 2215.404

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
4 February 1558ErectedDiocese of Goa Diocese of Cochin (erected)
Diocese of Malacca (erected)
1599Territory LostDiocese of Cochin Archdiocese of Angamalé (erected)
1606Territory LostDiocese of Cochin Mission "Sui Iuris" of Madura (erected)
9 January 1606Territory LostDiocese of Cochin Diocese of São Tomé of Meliapore (erected)
17 December 1659Territory LostDiocese of Cochin Vicariate Apostolic of Malabar (erected)
19 June 1952Territory LostDiocese of Cochin (Southern part) Diocese of Alleppey (erected)
19 September 1953Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Cochin (from Goa e Damão)
20 May 1955Territory LostDiocese of Cochin Diocese of Trivandrum

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1950236,365500,00047.3%96161122,1102318153ap1951
1970122,136454,76226.9%4910592,0701213023ap1971
1980143,000587,50024.3%5312652,2001615529ap1981
1990170,399678,94625.1%6422861,9814029533ap1991
199916,359556,2472.9%6625911795738837ap2000
2000166,861567,37129.4%70341041,6049543437ap2001
2001173,861580,37330.0%77451221,4258946637ap2002
2002176,423584,63530.2%76401161,52015146037ap2003
2003173,281604,40028.7%83471301,33212945537ap2004
2004162,188537,29330.2%87391261,2877951537ap2005
2006160,812562,74628.6%81491301,23714643938ap2007
2013184,860634,92829.1%96541501,23214042641ap2014
2016175,473618,89028.4%99671661,05714745444ap2017
2019174,967618,41028.3%1137719092016839048ap2020
2021176,680625,50028.2%1108719789618345350ap2022

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Series Episcoporum Ecclesiae Catholicae, Volume 1, Page 116
  • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 46, Page 83, to Page 87

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023
Code: web_d, v3.4.4, 25 Feb 2023; Data: 12 Jun 2023