Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco de Vasconcellos, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop of Cochin, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Apr 1673³Born
12 Feb 172147.8AppointedBishop of Cochin, India
26 Apr 172249.0Ordained BishopBishop of Cochin, India
30 Mar 174369.9DiedBishop of Cochin, India

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco de Vasconcellos
Bishop Francisco de Vasconcellos S.J. (born Apr 1673, died ) Bishop of Cochin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
Ordained BishopCalicut
Death PlaceGoa

  • a bishop for 20.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 163
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1722, Number 16
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 56, Number 4,057
  • bd/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 88, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast