Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Albert Zipfel

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Bismarck, North Dakota, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Sep 1935Born
18 Mar 196125.4Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA
16 May 198953.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA
16 May 198953.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Walla Walla
29 Jun 198953.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Walla Walla
31 Dec 199661.2AppointedBishop of Bismarck, North Dakota, USA
20 Feb 199761.4InstalledBishop of Bismarck, North Dakota, USA
19 Oct 201176.0RetiredBishop of Bismarck, North Dakota, USA
14 Jul 201983.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Bismarck, North Dakota, USA

MicroData Summary for Paul Albert Zipfel
Bishop Paul Albert Zipfel (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Bismarck

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint Louis, Archdiocese of Saint Louis, Missouri
Ordained BishopSaint Louis, Cathedral, Saint Louis, Archdiocese of Saint Louis, Missouri
Death PlaceOur Mother of Good Counsel Residence, Normandy, Archdiocese of Saint Louis, Missouri
Buried Place (Original)St. Mary's, Cemetery, Bismarck, Diocese of Bismarck, North Dakota

  • a priest for 58.3 years
  • a bishop for 30.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 116, Number 10,352
  • r: Bollettino, 19 Oct 2011
  • d: CB, 15 Jul 2019
  • loc: CB, 16 Jul 2019
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 242, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast