Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mariano Zaralli, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Hukwang, Shansi [Shanxi], and Shensi [Shaanxi], China

Titular Bishop of Magydus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Feb 1726Born
11 Sep 174822.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Observant Friars Minor
3 Apr 178761.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Hukwang, Shansi [Shanxi], and Shensi [Shaanxi], China
3 Apr 178761.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Magydus
12 Apr 178963.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Magydus
16 Apr 179064.1DiedVicar Apostolic of Hukwang, Shansi [Shanxi], and Shensi [Shaanxi], China

MicroData Summary for Mariano Zaralli
Bishop Mariano Zaralli O.F.M. Obs. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Hukwang, Shansi [Shanxi], and Shensi [Shaanxi]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNorma, Italy
Ordained BishopPeking
Death PlaceChao-kia-ling

  • a priest for 41.5 years
  • a bishop for 1.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1789, Number 10
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 272, and Page 455
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 26 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 13 Apr 2021

Quantcast