Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Lino Zanini

Deceased

Official Emeritus of the Roman Curia - Other

Titular Archbishop of Hadrianopolis in Haemimonto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 May 1909Born
2 Jul 193324.1Ordained PriestPriest of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
16 Jun 195950.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Hadrianopolis in Haemimonto
16 Jun 195950.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Dominican Republic
3 Sep 195950.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Hadrianopolis in Haemimonto
196151.6AppointedOfficial of the Secretariat of State
30 May 196253.0AppointedApostolic Delegate to Jerusalem and Palestine
4 Jan 196656.6AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Egypt, Arab Republic of
7 May 196960.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Argentina
29 Dec 197364.6AppointedOfficial of the Roman Curia - Other
15 May 198980.0RetiredOfficial of the Roman Curia - Other
25 Oct 199788.4DiedOfficial Emeritus of the Roman Curia - Other

MicroData Summary for Lino Zanini (VIAF: 88620745)
Archbishop Lino Zanini (born , died ) Official Emeritus of Roman Curia - Other

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRiese Pio X, Diocese of Treviso, Italy
Death PlaceVatican City, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Cemetery, Riese Pio X, Diocese of Treviso, Italy
Buried Place (Current) Santuario della Beata Vergine delle Cendrole, Riese Pio X, Diocese of Treviso, Italy

  • a priest for 64.3 years
  • a bishop for 38.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1959, Number 75
  • ab/pnun/xxeg: Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 58, Page 111

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast