Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José María Márquez Bernal, C.M.F. †

Deceased

Prelate Emeritus of Humahuaca, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Sep 1915Born
29 Mar 194125.5Ordained PriestPriest of Missionary Sons of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
10 Oct 197358.0AppointedPrelate of Humahuaca, Argentina
10 Oct 197358.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Buxentum
25 Nov 197358.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Buxentum
3 Nov 197762.1ResignedTitular Bishop of Buxentum
20 Feb 199175.4RetiredPrelate of Humahuaca, Argentina
17 Mar 199579.5DiedPrelate Emeritus of Humahuaca, Argentina

MicroData Summary for José María Márquez Bernal
Bishop José María Márquez Bernal C.M.F. (born , died ) Prelate Emeritus of Humahuaca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVillamanrique, Spain
Ordained BishopLa Candelaria, Church, Humahuaca, Territorial Prelature of Humahuaca

  • a priest for 53.9 years
  • a bishop for 21.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 24, Number 1,353

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast