Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Divo Zadi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Civita Castellana, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jan 1931Born
2 Aug 195322.5Ordained PriestPriest
10 Mar 198958.1AppointedBishop of Civita Castellana (, Orte, Gallese, Nepi e Sutri), Italy
8 Apr 198958.2Ordained BishopBishop of Civita Castellana (, Orte, Gallese, Nepi e Sutri), Italy
13 May 198958.3InstalledBishop of Civita Castellana (, Orte, Gallese, Nepi e Sutri), Italy
10 Dec 200776.8RetiredBishop of Civita Castellana, Italy
1 Apr 202190.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Civita Castellana, Italy

MicroData Summary for Divo Zadi
Bishop Divo Zadi (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Civita Castellana

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontefollonico
Ordained BishopSacré Coeur du Christ Roi, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceCivita Castellana, Diocese of Civita Castellana

  • a priest for 67.6 years
  • a bishop for 31.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 10 Dec 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Number 10,144
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 1 Apr 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 1 Apr 2021

Quantcast