Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bertram Víctor Wick Enzler

Bishop of Santo Domingo en Ecuador


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Mar 1955 Born
8 Dec 199136.7Ordained PriestPriest of Guayaquil, Ecuador
26 Oct 201358.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Guayaquil, Ecuador
26 Oct 201358.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Carpi
30 Nov 201358.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Carpi
24 Mar 201560.0AppointedBishop of Santo Domingo en Ecuador
23 May 201560.2InstalledBishop of Santo Domingo en Ecuador

MicroData Summary for Bertram Víctor Wick Enzler
Bishop Bertram Víctor Wick Enzler (born ) Bishop of Santo Domingo en Ecuador

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWaldkirch, Switzerland

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Santo Domingo en Ecuador.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 26 Oct 2013
  • ob: CB, 31 Oct 2013
  • c2+: CB, 1 Dec 2013
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 2,013, Number 152
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Number 17,985
  • ab: Bollettino, 24 Mar 2015
  • i: CB, 1 Apr 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast