Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles (Karl) Weber, S.V.D. †

Deceased

Bishop of Linyi [Ichow], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jun 1886Born
190720.5ProfessedMember of Society of the Divine Word
29 Sep 191024.2Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
2 Dec 193751.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Ichow [Linyi], China
2 Dec 193751.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Daldis
16 Oct 193852.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Daldis
11 Apr 194659.7AppointedBishop of Linyi [Ichow], China
15 Nov 197084.3DiedBishop of Linyi [Ichow], China

MicroData Summary for Charles (Karl) Weber
Bishop Charles (Karl) Weber S.V.D. (born , died ) Bishop of Linyi [Ichow]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMittelbexbach, Diocese of Speyer, Germany
Ordained BishopTsingtao
Death PlaceSankt Wendel, Germany

  • a priest for 60.1 years
  • a bishop for 32.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1938, Number 78
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 26 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast