Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dieudonné Watio

Bishop Emeritus of Bafoussam, Cameroon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Mar 1946 Born
5 Jul 197529.2Ordained PriestPriest
1 Apr 199549.0AppointedBishop of Nkongsamba, Cameroon
10 Jun 199549.2Ordained BishopBishop of Nkongsamba, Cameroon
5 Mar 201164.9AppointedBishop of Bafoussam, Cameroon
14 May 201165.1InstalledBishop of Bafoussam, Cameroon
19 Mar 202175.0RetiredBishop of Bafoussam, Cameroon

MicroData Summary for Dieudonné Watio (VIAF: 4995353)
Bishop Dieudonné Watio (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Bafoussam

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMbouda
Ordained BishopCathedral, Nkongsamba, Diocese of Nkongsamba

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Bafoussam.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 5 Mar 2011
  • i: CB, 16 May 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142, Number 12,565
  • r: Bollettino, 19 Mar 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 19 Mar 2021

Quantcast