Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Sigismund Waitz

Deceased

Archbishop of Salzburg, Austria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 May 1864Born
29 Sep 188622.3Ordained PriestPriest of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
9 May 191348.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
9 May 191348.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Cibyra
8 Jun 191349.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cibyra
9 Apr 192156.8AppointedApostolic Administrator of Innsbruck, Austria
10 Dec 193470.5SelectedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
17 Dec 193470.5ConfirmedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
27 Jan 193570.6InstalledArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria
30 Nov 193874.5RetiredApostolic Administrator of Innsbruck, Austria
30 Oct 194177.4DiedArchbishop of Salzburg, Austria

MicroData Summary for Sigismund Waitz
Archbishop Sigismund Waitz (born , died ) Archbishop of Salzburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBrixen
Death PlaceSalzburg, Archdiocese of Salzburg

  • a priest for 55.0 years
  • a bishop for 28.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1913, Number 31
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 5, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 16, Number 847, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast