Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anton Keil

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Salzburg, Austria

Titular Bishop of Dardanus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jun 1854Born
5 Oct 187622.3Ordained PriestPriest of Salzburg, Austria
31 Mar 191964.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Salzburg, Austria
31 Mar 191964.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Dardanus
17 Aug 191965.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dardanus
27 Nov 192672.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Salzburg, Austria

MicroData Summary for Anton Keil
Bishop Anton Keil (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Salzburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSalzburg, Archdiocese of Salzburg
Ordained BishopCathedral, Salzburg, Archdiocese of Salzburg

  • a priest for 50.1 years
  • a bishop for 7.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1919, Number 50
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 25, Number 1,389

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast