Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paulus Rusch

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Innsbruck, Austria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Oct 1903Born
26 Jul 193329.8Ordained PriestPriest of Innsbruck, Austria
15 Oct 193835.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Innsbruck, Austria
15 Oct 193835.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Lycopolis
30 Nov 193835.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lycopolis
9 Dec 194744.1AppointedTitular Bishop of MeloŽ in Isauria
26 Sep 196460.9AppointedBishop of Innsbruck-Feldkirch, Austria
13 Aug 198076.8RetiredBishop of Innsbruck, Austria
31 Mar 198682.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Innsbruck, Austria

MicroData Summary for Paulus Rusch
Bishop Paulus Rusch (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Innsbruck

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMŁnchen, Germany
Ordained BishopSankt Jakob, Church, Innsbruck, Apostolic Administration of Innsbruck
Death PlaceZams

  • a priest for 52.6 years
  • a bishop for 47.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1938, Number 95
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 5, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 16, Number 847, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast