Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franz Tschann

Deceased

Pro-Vicar Apostolic of Innsbruck, Austria

Titular Bishop of Panium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Oct 1872Born
29 Jun 189724.7Ordained PriestPriest of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
8 Aug 193663.8AppointedPro-Vicar General of Innsbruck, Austria
8 Aug 193663.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Panium
18 Oct 193664.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Panium
1 Oct 195582.9RetiredPro-Vicar General of Innsbruck, Austria
10 Oct 195684.0DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Innsbruck, Austria

MicroData Summary for Franz Tschann
Bishop Franz Tschann (born , died ) Pro-Vicar Apostolic of Innsbruck

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBludenz
Ordained BishopCathedral, Salzburg, Archdiocese of Salzburg
Death PlaceFeldkirch

  • a priest for 59.2 years
  • a bishop for 19.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1936, Number 73
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 5, Number 203

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast