Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Marie Vũ Tất

Bishop Emeritus of Hưng Ha, Viet Nam


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Mar 1944 Born
1 Apr 198743.0Ordained PriestPriest of Hưng Ha, Viet Nam
29 Mar 201066.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Hưng Ha, Viet Nam
29 Mar 201066.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Thisiduo
15 Jun 201066.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thisiduo
1 Mar 201166.9AppointedBishop of Hưng Ha, Viet Nam
22 Mar 201167.0InstalledBishop of Hưng Ha, Viet Nam
29 Aug 202076.4RetiredBishop of Hưng Ha, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Jean Marie Vũ Tất
Bishop Jean Marie Vũ Tất (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Hưng Ha

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDi Nu, Thach Tht, H Son Bnh
Ordained BishopIn front of, Sainte Thrse, Cathedral, Son Tay

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Hưng Ha.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 29 Mar 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ab: Bollettino, 1 Mar 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 202, Number 16,657
  • r: Bollettino, 29 Aug 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast