Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincenzo Viva

Bishop of Albano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Aug 1970 Born
10 Jul 199726.8Ordained PriestPriest of Nard˛-Gallipoli, Italy
11 Jun 202150.7AppointedBishop of Albano, Italy
8 Sep 202151.0Ordained BishopBishop of Albano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Viva
(VIAF: 256038895; WikiData: Q93252891)
Bishop Vincenzo Viva (born ) Bishop of Albano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFrankfurt, Diocese of Limburg, Germany
Ordained BishopPiazza Pia, near, San Pancrazio, Cathedral, Albano Laziale, Suburbicarian See of Albano

Please contact the Bishop through the Suburbicarian See of Albano.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 11 Jun 2021
  • c1: CB, 11 Jun 2021
  • ob/c2+: CB, 24 Jun 2021
  • c0: AM, 25 Jun 2021
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 249, Number 20,745

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_b, v3.3.5, 31 Dec 2023; Data: 23 Mar 2024