Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gabriel 聲gel Villa Vahos

Archbishop of Tunja, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jun 1962 Born
25 Oct 198927.3Ordained PriestPriest of Santa Rosa de Osos, Colombia
15 May 201451.9AppointedBishop of Oca鎙, Colombia
26 Jul 201452.1Ordained BishopBishop of Oca鎙, Colombia
15 Aug 201452.1InstalledBishop of Oca鎙, Colombia
11 Feb 202057.6AppointedArchbishop of Tunja, Colombia
24 Mar 202057.7InstalledArchbishop of Tunja, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Gabriel 聲gel Villa Vahos
Archbishop Gabriel 聲gel Villa Vahos (born ) Archbishop of Tunja

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSopetr嫕
Ordained BishopSe隳ra de las Misericordias, Basilica, Santa Rosa de Osos, Diocese of Santa Rosa de Osos

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Tunja.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 May 2014
  • ob: CB, 16 May 2014
  • c2: CB, 7 Jul 2014
  • c34: CB, 24 Jul 2014
  • i: CB, 14 Aug 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 219, Number 18,221
  • ab: Bollettino, 11 Feb 2020
  • i: AM, 4 Mar 2020
  • i: CB, 22 Mar 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast