Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Vilaplana Blasco

Bishop Emeritus of Huelva, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Dec 1944 Born
25 May 197227.4Ordained PriestPriest of Valencia, Spain
20 Nov 198439.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Valencia, Spain
20 Nov 198439.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Bladia
27 Dec 198440.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bladia
23 Aug 199146.7AppointedBishop of Santander, Spain
17 Jul 200661.6AppointedBishop of Huelva, Spain
23 Sep 200661.7InstalledBishop of Huelva, Spain
15 Jun 202075.5RetiredBishop of Huelva, Spain

MicroData Summary for José Vilaplana Blasco
Bishop José Vilaplana Blasco (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Huelva

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBenimarfull
Ordained BishopCathedral, Valencia, Archdiocese of Valencia

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Huelva.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 17 Jul 2006
  • r: Bollettino, 15 Jun 2020
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 90, Number 7,634

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast