Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Geraldo João Paulo Roger Verdier

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Guajará-Mirim, Rondonia, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Mar 1937Born
29 Jun 196225.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Guajará-Mirim, Rondonia, Brazil
30 Mar 196326.0Ordained PriestPriest of Guajará-Mirim, Rondonia, Brazil
31 Jul 198043.3AppointedBishop of Guajará-Mirim, Rondonia, Brazil
25 Oct 198043.5Ordained BishopBishop of Guajará-Mirim, Rondonia, Brazil
8 Dec 201174.6ResignedBishop of Guajará-Mirim, Rondonia, Brazil
22 Oct 201780.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Guajará-Mirim, Rondonia, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Geraldo João Paulo Roger Verdier (VIAF: 5237122)
Bishop Geraldo João Paulo Roger Verdier (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Guajará-Mirim

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlban, Archdiocese of Albi (-Castres-Lavaur), France
Ordained DeaconSt-Joseph des Carmes of Catholic Institute, Church, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Ordained BishopN.D. du Rosaire, Guajará-Mirim, Diocese of Guajará-Mirim, Rondonia
Death PlacePorto Velho
Buried Place (Original)Pérola da Mamoré

  • a priest for 54.5 years
  • a bishop for 36.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 9 Dec 2011
  • d: CB, 22 Oct 2017
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Necrology (back)
  • od/c0/loc: AJ, 3 Jul 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 64, Number 4,999
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 73, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast