Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Roger Joseph Vangheluwe

Bishop Emeritus of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Nov 1936 Born
1 Feb 196326.2Ordained PriestPriest of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium
15 Dec 198448.1AppointedBishop of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium
3 Feb 198548.2Ordained BishopBishop of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium
23 Apr 201073.4ResignedBishop of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Roger Joseph Vangheluwe (VIAF: 1853273)
Bishop Roger Joseph Vangheluwe (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Brugge {Bruges}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoeselare
Ordained BishopSt. Sauveur, Cathedral, Bruges, Diocese of Brugge {Bruges}

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Brugge {Bruges}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 23 Apr 2010
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 239, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 90, Number 7,640

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast