Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rémy Victor Vancottem

Bishop Emeritus of Namur {Namen}, Belgium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jul 1943 Born
27 Jun 196925.9Ordained PriestPriest of Mechelen-Brussel {Malines-Brussels}, Belgium
15 Feb 198238.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mechelen-Brussel {Malines-Brussels}, Belgium
15 Feb 198238.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Unizibira
21 Mar 198238.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Unizibira
31 May 201066.8AppointedBishop of Namur {Namen}, Belgium
5 Jun 201975.8RetiredBishop of Namur {Namen}, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Rémy Victor Vancottem
Bishop Rémy Victor Vancottem (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Namur {Namen}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTubize
Ordained BishopSt. Jean Baptiste, Wavre

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Namur {Namen}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 31 May 2010
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 239, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 5 Jun 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 73, Number 5,859

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast