Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles-Omer Valois

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Saint-Jérôme, Québec, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Apr 1924Born
3 Jun 195026.1Ordained PriestPriest of Montréal, Québec, Canada
10 Jun 197753.1AppointedBishop of Saint-Jérôme, Québec, Canada
29 Jun 197753.1Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Jérôme, Québec, Canada
22 Jan 199772.7ResignedBishop of Saint-Jérôme, Québec, Canada
4 Aug 201389.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Saint-Jérôme, Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Charles-Omer Valois
Bishop Charles-Omer Valois (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Saint-Jérôme

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontréal, Archdiocese of Montréal, Québec
Ordained BishopCathedral, Saint-Jérôme, Diocese of Saint-Jérôme, Québec

  • a priest for 63.1 years
  • a bishop for 36.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 5 Aug 2013
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 44, Number 3,016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast