Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luiz Demétrio Valentini

Bishop Emeritus of Jales, Sao Paulo, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jan 1940 Born
6 Feb 196525.0Ordained PriestPriest
8 Jun 198242.3AppointedBishop of Jales, Sao Paulo, Brazil
31 Jul 198242.5Ordained BishopBishop of Jales, Sao Paulo, Brazil
21 Oct 201575.7RetiredBishop of Jales, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Luiz Demétrio Valentini
Bishop Luiz Demétrio Valentini (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Jales

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSão Valentim
Ordained BishopSt. Joseph, Cathedral, Erexim, Diocese of Erexim, Rio Grande do Sul

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Jales.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 21 Oct 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 76, Number 6,139

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast