Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop György Udvardy

Archbishop of Veszprém, Hungary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 May 1960 Born
15 Jun 198525.0Ordained PriestPriest of Esztergom, Hungary
24 Jan 200443.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Esztergom-Budapest, Hungary
24 Jan 200443.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Marazanae
21 Feb 200443.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Marazanae
9 Apr 201150.9AppointedBishop of Pécs, Hungary
25 Apr 201150.9InstalledBishop of Pécs, Hungary
12 Jul 201959.1AppointedArchbishop of Veszprém, Hungary
12 Jul 201959.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Pécs, Hungary
31 Aug 201959.2InstalledArchbishop of Veszprém, Hungary
6 Jan 202160.6CeasedApostolic Administrator of Pécs, Hungary

MicroData Summary for György Udvardy
Archbishop György Udvardy (born ) Archbishop of Veszprém

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBalassagyarmat, Archdiocese of Esztergom
Ordained BishopEsztergom, Archdiocese of Esztergom-Budapest

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Veszprém.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 9 Apr 2011
  • i: CB, 12 Apr 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 174, Number 14,536
  • ab: Bollettino, 12 Jul 2019
  • aadm: CB, 24 Nov 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 26 Feb 2021

Quantcast