Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Elio Tinti

Bishop Emeritus of Carpi, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Aug 1936 Born
25 Jul 196023.9Ordained PriestPriest of Bologna, Italy
17 Jun 200063.8AppointedBishop of Carpi, Italy
26 Aug 200064.0Ordained BishopBishop of Carpi, Italy
24 Sep 200064.1InstalledBishop of Carpi, Italy
14 Nov 201175.2RetiredBishop of Carpi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Elio Tinti
Bishop Elio Tinti (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Carpi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBologna, Archdiocese of Bologna
Ordained PriestSan Petronio, Basilica, Bologna, Archdiocese of Bologna
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Cathedral, Bologna, Archdiocese of Bologna

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Carpi.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 14 Nov 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 160, Number 13,826
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 224, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • loc: AM, 4 Sep 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast