Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Felicissimo Stefano Tinivella, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Ancona e Numana, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Aug 1908Born
28 Feb 193122.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
9 Mar 195546.5AppointedBishop of Diano-Teggiano, Italy
8 May 195546.6Ordained BishopBishop of Diano-Teggiano, Italy
11 Sep 196153.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Torino {Turin}, Italy
11 Sep 196153.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Cana
18 Sep 196557.0ResignedCoadjutor Bishop of Torino {Turin}, Italy
18 Sep 196557.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Uthina
9 Nov 196557.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Ventimiglia, Italy
22 Feb 196758.4AppointedArchbishop of Ancona e Numana, Italy
6 Jul 196859.8ResignedArchbishop of Ancona e Numana, Italy
6 Jul 196859.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Bellicastrum
12 Dec 197062.2ResignedTitular Archbishop of Bellicastrum
6 Aug 197869.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Ancona e Numana, Italy

MicroData Summary for Felicissimo Stefano Tinivella
Archbishop Felicissimo Stefano Tinivella O.F.M. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Ancona e Numana

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastagnole Piemonte, Archdiocese of Torino {Turin}
Ordained BishopSt. Antoine, Church, Torino, Archdiocese of Torino {Turin}
Death PlaceTorino, Archdiocese of Torino {Turin}
Buried Place (Original)Family Tomb, Cemetery, Pinerolo

  • a priest for 47.4 years
  • a bishop for 23.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1955, Number 31
  • ab/2u22: Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 59, Page 361
  • loc: CB, 5 Aug 2019
  • ob.loc: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 75, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast