Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Edward Taylor, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Stockholm, Sweden


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Nov 1914Born
25 May 194025.5Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
2 Jul 196247.6AppointedBishop of Stockholm, Sweden
21 Sep 196247.8Ordained BishopBishop of Stockholm, Sweden
3 Jun 197661.5ResignedBishop of Stockholm, Sweden
9 Sep 197661.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Stockholm, Sweden

MicroData Summary for John Edward Taylor
Bishop John Edward Taylor O.M.I. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Stockholm

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEast St. Louis, IL, USA
Ordained BishopSalle Bleue, Stockholm, Diocese of Stockholm

  • a priest for 36.2 years
  • a bishop for 13.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1962, Number 154
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 574

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast