Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop József Tamás

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Alba Iulia, Romania

Titular Bishop of Valabria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Nov 1944 Born
21 Apr 196823.4Ordained PriestPriest of Alba Iulia, Romania
18 Dec 199652.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Alba Iulia, Romania
18 Dec 199652.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Valabria
1 Mar 199752.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Valabria
24 Dec 201975.1RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Alba Iulia, Romania

MicroData Summary for József Tamás
Bishop József Tamás (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Alba Iulia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSiculeni
Ordained BishopBasilica, Sumuleu Ciuc (Csíksomlyó)

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Alba Iulia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Number 12,929
  • r: Bollettino, 24 Dec 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast