Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Mister Tamás Szabó

Note/Previous Titular See: (renounced the priesthood)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Oct 1956 Born
20 Aug 198831.8Ordained PriestPriest
28 Nov 200145.0AppointedBishop of Hungary, Military
12 Jan 200245.2Ordained BishopBishop of Hungary, Military
15 Mar 200750.3ResignedBishop of Hungary, Military

MicroData Summary for Tamás Szabó
Mister Tamás Szabó (born )

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZirc

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 15 Mar 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Number 14,116
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 224, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 9 Mar 2021

Quantcast