Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Swarbrick

Bishop of Lancaster, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jul 1958 Born
10 Jul 198224.0Ordained PriestPriest of Lancaster, England, Great Britain
12 Feb 201859.6AppointedBishop of Lancaster, England, Great Britain
9 Apr 201859.7Ordained BishopBishop of Lancaster, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Paul Swarbrick
Bishop Paul Swarbrick (born ) Bishop of Lancaster

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGarstang, Preston, Lancashire, Diocese of Lancaster, England
Ordained PriestSts. Michael and Mary, Church, Garstang, Preston, Lancashire, Diocese of Lancaster, England
Ordained BishopSt. Peter, Cathedral, Lancaster, Diocese of Lancaster, England

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Lancaster.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 12 Feb 2018
  • c1/loc: CL, 12 Feb 2018
  • ob: CL, 19 Feb 2018
  • c2+: CB, 13 Mar 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 236, Number 19,758

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast